1. Samuel Nicholas (1) | Bn. 1744 Dth. 27 Aug 1790 | 28 Nov 1775 27 Aug 1783 | Major |
2. William W. Burrows (2) | Bn: 16 Jan 1758 Dth. 6 Mar 1804 | 12 Jul 1798 6 Mar 1804 | Lt. Colonel |
3. Franklin Wharton (3) | Bn: 23 Jul 1767 Dth. 1 Sep 1818 | 7 Mar 1819 1 Sep 1818 | Lt. Colonel |
4. Anthony Gale | Bn: 17 Sep 1782 Dth. 1843 | 3 Mar 1819 16 Oct 1820 | Lt. Colonel |
5. Archibald Henderson (4) | Bn: 21 Jan 1783 Dth. 6 Jan 1859 | 17 Oct 1820 6 Jan 1859 | Colonel |
6. John Harris (5) | Bn: 20 May 1790 Dth. 2 May 1864 | 7 Jan 1859 12 May 1864 | Colonel |
7. Jacob Zeilin (6) | Bn: 16 Jul 1806 Dth. 18 Nov 1880 | 10 Jun 1864 31 Oct 1876 | Br. General |
8. Charles McCawley | Bn: 29 Jan 1827 Dth. 13 Oct 1891 | 1 Nov 1876 29 Jan 1891 | Colonel |
9. Charles Heywood (7) | Bn: 3 Oct 1839 Dth. 26 Feb 1915 | 30 Jan 1891 2 Oct 1903 | Maj. General |
10. George Elliott (8) | Bn: 30 Nov 1846 Dth. 4 Nov 1931 | 3 Oct 1903 30 Nov 1910 | Maj. General |
11. William P. Biddle (9) | Bn: 17 Dec 1853 Dth. 25 Feb 1923 | 3 Feb 1911 24 Feb 1914 | Maj. General |
12. George Barnett (GNA) | Bn: 9 Dec 1859 Dth. 27 Apr 1930 | 25 Feb 1914 30 Jun 1920 | Maj. General |
13. John A. Lejeune (GNA) | Bn: 10 Jan 1867 Dth. 20 Nov 1942 | 1 Jul 1920 4 Mar 1929 | Maj. General |
14. Wendell Neville (GNA) (MOH) | Bn: 12 May 1870 Dth. 8 Jul 1930 | 5 Mar 1929 8 Jul 1930 | Maj. General |
15. Ben H. Fuller (GNA) | Bn: 27 Feb 1870 Dth. 8 Jun 1937 | 9 Jul 1930 28 Feb 1934 | Maj. General |
16. John H. Russell (GNA) | Bn: 14 Nov 1872 Dth. 6 Mar 1947 | 1 Mar 1934 30 Nov 1936 | Maj. General |
17. Thomas Holcomb (11) | Bn: 5 Aug 1879 Dth. 24 May 1965 | 1 Dec 1936 31 Dec 1943 | Lt. General |
18. Alexander A. Vandegrift(12)(MOH) | Bn: 13 Mar 1887 Dth. 8 May 1973 | 1 Jan 1944 31 Dec 1947 | General |
19. Clifton B. Cates | Bn: 31 Aug 1893 Dth. 4 Jun 1970 | 1 Jan 1948 31 Dec 1951 | General |
20. Lemuel C. Shepherd, Jr. | Bn: 10 Feb 1896 Dth. 6 Aug 1990 | 1 Jan 1952 31 Dec 1955 | General |
21. Randolph McCall Pate (13) | Bn: 11 Feb 1898 Dth. 31 Jul 1961 | 1 Jan 1956 31 Dec 1959 | General |
22. David M. Shoup (14) (MOH) | Bn: 30 Dec 1904 Dth. 13 Jan 1983 | 1 Jan 1960 31 Dec 1963 | General |
23. Wallace M. Greene, Jr.(GNA) | Bn: 27 Dec 1907 Dth: 1 Jan 1964 | 1 Jan 1964 31 Dec 1967 | General |
24. Leonard F. Chapman, Jr. | Bn: 3 Nov 1913 Dth: 1 Jan 1968 | 1 Jan 1968 31 Dec 1971 | General |
25. Robert E. Cushman, Jr. (GNA) | Bn: 24 Dec 1914 Dth: 2 Jan 1985 | 1 Jan 1972 30 Jun 1975 | General |
26. Louis H. Wilson (MOH) | Bn: 11 Feb 1920 Dth: | 1 Jul 1975 30 Jun 1979 | General |
27. Robert H. Barrow | Bn: 5 Feb 1922 Dth: | 1 Jul 1979 30 Jun 1983 | General |
28. Paul X. Kelley | Bn: 11 Nov 1928 Dth: | 1 Jul 1983 30 Jun 1987 | General |
29. Alfred M. Gray, Jr. | Bn: 22 Jun 1928 Dth: | 1 Jul 1987 30 Jun 1991 | General |
30. Carl E. Mundy, Jr. | Bn: 16 Jul 1935 Dth: | 1 Jul 1991 30 Jun 1995 | General |
31. Charles C. Krulak (GNA) | Bn: 4 Mar 1942 Dth: | 30 Jun 1995 30 Jun 1999 | General |
32. James L. Jones | Bn: 19 Dec 1943 Dth: | 1 Jul 1999 13 Jan 2003 | General |
33. Michael W. Hagee | Bn: 1 Dec 1944 Dth: | 13 Jan 2003 13 Nov 2006 | General |
34. James T. Conway | Bn: 26 Dec 1947 Dth: | 14 Nov 2006 Incumbent | General |